|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 06/02/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2878 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
100968 | |
Swindon Works | 17/06/1953 | 10/08/1953 | 55 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
188854 | |
Swindon Works | 09/03/1955 | 18/04/1955 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7638 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4065 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
287700 | |
Swindon Works | 07/02/1956 | 26/03/1956 | 49 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2919 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 27/12/1956 | 03/04/1957 | 98 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7643 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4084 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
381931 | |
Swindon Works | 12/09/1958 | 07/11/1958 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4015 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
471527 | |
Swindon Works | 27/07/1960 | 27/09/1960 | 63 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7694 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
555538 | |
Swindon Works | 03/10/1960 | 06/10/1960 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 23/05/1961 | 22/06/1961 | 31 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2728 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 09/10/1962 | 05/12/1962 | 58 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
641690 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/06/1950 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7032, name: DENBIGH CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
10/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
15/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
06/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2878 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1953. Dep: 10/08/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/02/1954 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2873 | ||
09/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/03/1955. Dep: 18/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7638 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4065 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1956. Dep: 26/03/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2919 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/12/1956. Dep: 03/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7643 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4084 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 4015 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/07/1960. Dep: 27/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7694 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
03/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 06/10/1960. | ||
23/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1961. Dep: 22/06/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 2728 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/12/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2593 | ||
09/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1962. Dep: 05/12/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7032 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Risca |