Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2871 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16277 Week
» 69293 Month
» 188820 Year
» 3215673 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7036 |
05/06/1962 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
05/06/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7036 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7930 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
19/04/1972 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
09/06/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7036 from Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
10/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|