Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1188 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14594 Week
» 67610 Month
» 187137 Year
» 3213990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7069 |
22/02/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
35 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
B-B |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Order Number |
BP3039 |
Works Number |
7973 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
22/02/1963 to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
Withdrawn |
03/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
8 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1972 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
22/02/1963 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/02/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7069 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7973 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7069 |
|
|
08/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|