Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15469 Week
» 68485 Month
» 188012 Year
» 3214865 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D7094 |
14/12/1963 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and light green skirting, white window surrounds |
14/12/1963 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow ends and light green skirting |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D7094 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7998 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow ends and light green skirting |
|
|
01/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7094 from Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|