02/06/1951 |
Eastbourne Exhibition |
An exhibition of locomotives, open to the general public, was a big attraction on Saturday afternoon, 2nd June, The exhibits comprised electric loco. No. 20003, Class 7 No. 70009 Alfred the Great, Class 4 No. 75000, Class 5 No. 73001, Fell diesel No. 10100, diesel shunter No. 15227, representing the work of Ashford, Crewe, Swindon, Derby, Derby and Ashford respectively. |
SLS/195107 |
02/06/1951 |
Railway Exhibition At Eastbourne |
On the occasion of the opening of the Conference of the Internationa, Railway Union on 2/6 in Eastbourne, a very fine exhibition was staged in the goods yard there which was open to the public in brilliant sunshine during the afternoon. Locomotives displayed were: diesel-electric 0-6-0 shunter, No. 15227, built at Ashford; Fell diesel-mechanical 4-8-4, No. 10100; class 4 4-6-0 No. 75000, just completed at Swindon. carrying shedplate 82C; class 5 4-6-0 No. 73001, built at Derby in May; class 7 4-6-2 No. 70009 Alfred the Great, straight from trial express running on the Waterloo-Bournemouth service but normally shedded at Norwich; S.R. 'CC' electric locomotive No. 20003. All except No. 20003 were practically new engines. Many of us saw for the first time on that occasion the 'Fell' locomotive and the smaller standard 4-6-0 type of B.R. creation. All were clean, cold, and available for close inspection, with inspectors and other officials on hand to give information. There were also fine examples of the latest Festival rolling stock, including dining and kitchen cars, goods wagons and vans, semaphore and colour-light signals, bull-headed also flat-bottom track in complete lengths, as well as some small specimens of modern machinery. This was a red-letter day in East Sussex! Alfred the Great hauled the four new coaches down the previous day as a special; No. 75000 towed the D-M, which is a decidedly formidable-looking 'box of tricks.' |
SLS/195108 |
19/02/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) |
New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. |
SLS/196104 |
24/03/1963 |
Wolverhampton Works (Foundry Siding) |
Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. |
SLS/196304 |
15/05/1963 |
Derby Works (Foundry Siding) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. |
SLS/196304 |
16/06/1963 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay) |
Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41531 cut up, 41535, 73001/32, 75012, D147, D2396, D2507, D2911, D3017/21/3/56/68, D3305, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay-D3, D46, D62, D5008, D5133/48; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay-D5215-21, D7568-73. Finishing Shop: D81, D116/9, D5010. Paint Shop: 75064, D5213/4. Diesel Erecting Shop: D34, D52, D75, D97, D112, D134/5, D141, D160, D5024/82. Test House: D109, D5012/4/32/86, D5138, D5213. Yard (by paint shop): 42178, D2, D4, D6, D7, D42/3, D72, D98, D114, D131, D149, D154, D3122, D5002/9/13, D5142, D5206/10/1, ED4. Stone Pit: 63578, D2503. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 44417, 47341, 47429, 47465, 73007, 75011/50, D90. Stored outside offices: 43593, 43645, 43754, 47417, 10000/201/2/3. |
SLS/196307 |
12/07/1963 |
Derby Works (Stone Pit) |
Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-47341, 47429, 47673, 73032, 75011, 75012, 75050, D134, D2504, D2911, D3024, D3123, D5013, ED6, ED7. Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D153, D5015, D5081, D5092, D5144. Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(New) D5220, D5221, D5222, D5233, D7568, D7569, D7570, D7571, D7572, D7573, D7574, D7575, D7576, D7577 new. Finishing Shop: D97, D135, D5008, D5029, D5219. Paint Shop: D5217. Foundry Row: 41537, 42472, 42500, 43599, 48006, 48105/407, 73007/143, 75042, D2503. Diesel Erecting Shop: D42, D67, D79, D110, D115, D131, D136, D137, D141, D155, D5082. Yard by Paint Shop: D2, D3, D7, D56, D69, D72, D81, D124, D149, D154, ED4. Test House: D34, D91, D119, D5078, D218. Stone Pit: 73001, 73090, D5216. Stored outside offices: 10000, 10201/2/3. |
SLS/196308 |