24/04/1951 |
Derby Works |
On 24/4/1951 new 5MT 73001 was complete, 73002/3 had the boilers mounted on the frames, 73004 has frames only in position. New Diesel shunter 12088 was almost complete, 12089 frames only. In the works, the following interesting engines were in for repairs: (40)487, 41536, 47004. Additional engines stored near station are: (40)404, 40426, 43496. Two J39 class were in works : 64953/5. By 5/5/1951, 73002 was almost complete; in addition, 41005 was in works for special examination, 41020 for general repairs, 41844 also for special examination. 58865 was in the works yard covered with a tarpaulin, and 40462 an 22970 were nearby. |
SLS/195106 |
05/05/1951 |
Derby Works |
On 5th May, 73002 was complete in Works, 73003 almost finished, 73004 boiler in position, 73005 frames only. By 22nd May, 73004 complete, 73005/6 frames only. Diesels, on the same date, were 12088 complete, 12089 almost so, 12090/1 frames only. In works yard were 40470, 41006. Other regions' engines in works were : 64744 (39A), 64796, 64801 (37A), 64887 (40A) and 0-6-0PT 2088. |
SLS/195107 |
27/10/1951 |
Effects of withdrawal of Standard 7MT\'s on GE Section |
During w/e 27th October, the effects of the withdrawal of the Standard 7MT Pacifics for mechanical alterations was very apparent on the GE Section. The difficulties of providing suitable power were alleviated to some extent by the presence of the Southern Region light Pacifics but even so, on 24th October, the Down 'Norfolkman' suffered a late start of 15 minutes waiting engine, but despite speed restrictions at Ilford and Gidea Park this train, hauled by 61177, only lost four minutes to Ipswich. On 25th October, 61205 put up a fine performance despite these speed orders, coming to a stand at Ipswich two minutes early at 10.44. In general, however, the running of the fast trains was not up to the standard of the Pacific workings, although the position steadily improved when the initial shock of the withdrawal of the Pacifics had passed. During the next week some additions were made to GE Section motive power, and on Saturday, 3rd November, the Norfolkman left behind 73000. Subsequently, on Monday, 5th November, 73002 was observed on the 8.30 Norwich down, and a new addition to the Eastern Region engines, 34089 from the Southern Region, took charge of the 9.30 'Norfolkman.' |
SLS/195201 |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (erecting shop) |
In erecting shop: 4634, 31619, 31800/16/73, 33009/12, 34031/9/70, 35001/15, 41296/9, 73002/51, 76005/62, 80034/43/82/162, 82014/24, 92206. In Works yard: 30512, 31618, 34054, 35006, 41291, 80035, 82022. On scrap sidings behind Works: 30504, 30903/4, 31414, 31904, 32352. |
SLS/196303 |
16/10/1967 |
United Waggon Co., Newport (Mon.) |
Dumped locomotives: 34005, 34008, 34009, 34017, 34026, 34032, 34047, 34057, 34088, 34098, 34104, 34108, 48249, 48509, 73002, 73016, 76039, 76058, 76063, 76088, 78063, 82003, 82031, 82034. |
SLS/196712 |