|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1951 | Derby Works | On 5th May, 73002 was complete in Works, 73003 almost finished, 73004 boiler in position, 73005 frames only. By 22nd May, 73004 complete, 73005/6 frames only. Diesels, on the same date, were 12088 complete, 12089 almost so, 12090/1 frames only. In works yard were 40470, 41006. Other regions' engines in works were : 64744 (39A), 64796, 64801 (37A), 64887 (40A) and 0-6-0PT 2088. | SLS/195107 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
15/02/1964 | Worcester Works | 1445 (85C), 4992 (82B), 6846 (82E), 7926 (85A), 8405 (85D), 73003 (82E). | SLS/196403 |
23/02/1964 | Southern Withdrawals | With the exception of 33007, these engines (33007, 31833, 35002/15) are to remain at depots and not to be moved or used until notice for movement is given. | SLS/196403 |
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73003 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A) | ||
30/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E) | ||
28/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
31/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73003 | ||
06/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |