Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17197 Week
» 70213 Month
» 189740 Year
» 3216593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73017 |
on |
28/09/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/09/1951 |
Derby Works |
On 29th September, the following engines, among others were noted: 73016 returned to works for minor adjustments; 73017 on shed; 73018 in paint shop ; 73019 almost complete; 73020/1 boilers on; 73022/3 frames only. 40741, 41767, 41932/5/53/6/7/9, 43824 all in works yard. |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73017 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) |
|
|
14/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
04/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73017 |
|
|
03/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|