Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 207 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6414 Week
» 3927 Month
» 231811 Year
» 1453376 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73027 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 12/1951 to Blackpool Central (28A)
Withdrawal Fri 07/02/1964
Scrapping During 04/1964 at Locomotive Works (Eastleigh)
Service Life 12 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
28A Blackpool Central (New) m/e 12/1951
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/10/1953
82C Swindon 4w/e 17/07/1954
   Withdrawn 07/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 28A Blackpool Central w/e 22/12/1951
LOAN 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/09/1956
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN   07/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/09/1961 Swindon Works (Works Sidings) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73027
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Blackpool Central (28A)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
07/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 73027    

prev prev