Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3004 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16410 Week
» 69426 Month
» 188953 Year
» 3215806 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73028 |
on |
28/12/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/10/1959 |
Eastleigh Works (On Works) |
On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. |
SLS/195912 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73028 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Blackpool Central (28A) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
20/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) |
|
|
04/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
01/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73028 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|