Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 763 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6368 Week
» 17915 Month
» 417597 Year
» 494184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73050   04/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 04/1954 to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)
Withdrawal During 06/1968
Service Life 14 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
71G Bath Green Park (S&D) (New) 04/1954
85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 11/08/1962
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 17/11/1962
87F Llanelly 6w/e 13/04/1964
6D Shrewsbury w/e 25/04/1964
9J Agecroft w/e 30/04/1966
9H Patricroft w/e 22/10/1966
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 2w/e 17/11/1962
WDN   01/04/1964
TOSTORE UNK   2w/e 13/04/1964
REINS 6D Shrewsbury w/e 25/04/1964
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 4w/e 07/05/1966
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 29/06/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 73050
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (71G)
   
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
06/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 73050    

prev prev