Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 668 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18471 Week
» 71487 Month
» 191014 Year
» 3217867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73060 |
on |
26/08/1954 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
66A |
Polmadie |
on |
26/08/1954 |
ALLOC |
66B |
Motherwell |
4w/e |
29/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
01/05/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73060 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
29/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73060 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|