31/10/1954 |
York Area |
October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
14/12/1954 |
York MPD |
Fort William shed is not often represented at York, but on 14/12/54 62031 (K1-63D) was at York shed after a visit to Doncaster Works. 67745 (L1-34D) was at York on 15/12/54 after a visit to Darlington, and 67780 (L1-34E) in similar circumstances on 31/12/54. On 20/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-4T 80113. from Doncaster Works was at York, en route for the Scottish Region, and fitted with tablet exchange apparatus. On the same date a surprising arrival at York was 69369 (N5-34E), en route for Darlington Works for repair owing to an alleged surplus of repair work at Gorton with a corresponding shortage at Darlington. 69369 was apparently overcome by its long journey, as a hot bearing developed necessitating attention at York shed; it reappeared in York shed yard on 30/12/54. 63755 (O1-54B), fitted with additional pumps for the Tyne Dock-Consett working, was also at York on the same date. On 28/12/54 46469 (30E) was at York after a visit to Darlington Works. 44669 (68A) worked the Holbeck duty on the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City-Scarborough, etc., on 28/12/54, and the same duty was taken on 30/12/54 by 44792 (68A). 73066 (20A) has continued appearances on this turn, while 73065 (19B) has also visited York on Millhouses turns, particularly the 10.20 a.m. Bristol-Newcastle. On 29/12/54 the 3.55 p.m. relief arrival at York from Birmingham (New Street) was worked by 42756 (17B). On 31/12/54 new BR Standard 2-6-2T 82029 was at York on arrival in the North Eastern Region from Swindon. Ex-Works engines on shed or this date also included 61215, (B1-53B), 67780 (L1-34E), and 90382 (AY-53A). |
SLS/195501 |
12/11/1959 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay) |
Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. |
SLS/195912 |
15/05/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. |
SLS/196106 |
09/07/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: E3071 (arrived at Derby on June 20th for testing purposes), ED3, D37, D62, D79, D104, D117/8, D176, D3018, D5009/27, D5135. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: D3291. Test House: D46, D97, D173/5, D308, D5019. Shunter Test House: D3125. New Building: D180-D189. Finishing Shop: D63, D92, D177/8, D287. Erecting Shop: ED1, D3177, 13121, 41533, 42095, 42240/7, 44049, 44214, 44362, 47532, 48607, 73066/70, 73131/7/8, 75038/63. Paint Shop: D174, MR1000. 'Stone Pit': 44583, 48167, 48704. 'Foundry Row': 44030, 44158. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D38, D50, D5017, 10201/3, plus frames of an unidentified diesel shunter (d12000?). Shop Road: 48673. 'Bone Yard': 42146/84 (both stored). |
SLS/196208 |
10/08/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex-Works on Shed: D38 (82A), D3018 (2A), D5075 (2A), D5139 (9A), 41533 (41E), 42095 (12C), 44162 (18A), 45240 (5A) - Ex Crewe, 48167 (18A), 48704 (15B), 73066 (14D), D54 new ex Crewe arrived on Shed towing D2506 (5A) for works attention. |
SLS/196209 |
26/04/1964 |
Swindon Works (A Shop) |
Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. |
SLS/196406 |