19/09/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. |
SLS/196110 |
01/02/1964 |
Branch line news (Works Yard) |
Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
Darlington Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. |
SLS/196403 |
25/04/1964 |
Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. |
SLS/196406 |