Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1612 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19415 Week
» 72431 Month
» 191958 Year
» 3218811 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73078 |
on |
21/05/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
on |
21/05/1955 |
ALLOC |
66E |
Carstairs |
4w/e |
05/02/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/07/1961 |
Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) |
Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. |
SLS/196108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/05/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73078 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73078 |
|
|
21/10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|