Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1923 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19726 Week
» 72742 Month
» 192269 Year
» 3219122 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73081 |
on |
17/06/1955 |
Names Carried
Date From |
Name |
17/06/1955 |
EXCALIBUR |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
2w/e |
07/07/1955 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
14/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
P |
06/06/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73081, name: EXCALIBUR Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
31/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73081 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|