Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 499 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5100 Week
» 16647 Month
» 416329 Year
» 492916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73082   07/1955

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1955 CAMELOT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1955 to Stewarts Lane (73A)
Withdrawal Sun 19/06/1966
Service Life 10 yrs, 11 mths , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73A Stewarts Lane (New) 07/1955
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70C Guildford 4w/e 08/06/1965
   Withdrawn 19/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 07/07/1955
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 06/06/1965
WDN   w/e 19/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 73082, name: CAMELOT
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
19/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 73082    

prev prev