Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 296 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4034 Week
» 1547 Month
» 229431 Year
» 1450996 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73083 m/e 07/1955

Names Carried
Date From Name
07/1955 PENDRAGON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 07/1955 to Stewarts Lane (73A)
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/09/1966
Scrapping During 02/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 11 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
73A Stewarts Lane (New) m/e 07/1955
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70B Feltham m/e 14/09/1964
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) w/e 20/11/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 04/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 73A Stewarts Lane 2w/e 07/07/1955
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 2w/e 20/11/1964
WDN   w/e 04/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1964 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard, Waiting Works) Works Yard, Waiting Works: 73050, 73083. Works Yard, Ex Works: 34089, 73114. Erecting Shop: 30069, 32640, 32678 Undergoing restoration, 34005, 34018, 34026, 34037, 34042, 34076, 35007, 35019 35022/3, 73052, 73085/9, 76067, 76082, 80016, 80145, 80154, 15218, 15233, 20002, D3041, D3220, D3459, D3667, D6547, D6554. Scrap Yard: 30133 Intact, 34049 Remains, 82008 Intact. SLS/196407
14/09/1964 Southern engines for storage 34015/9/33/42/77/9, 35005/10/2/22, 73083/7, 76019 are to be stored after transfer, (In view of large scale moves to a few sheds only, the usual arrangement for such transfers has not been used this time. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73083, name: PENDRAGON
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
20/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
04/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 73083    

prev prev