Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1895 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 15938 Week
» 80892 Month
» 283556 Year
» 3310409 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73088 |
on |
01/09/1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
17/05/1958 |
Bath Green Park MPD |
Despite the fact this shed (ex-S. & D.J.R.) is now in the W.R. it is still borrowing off the S.R. and latest arrivals are 73087/8 of Stewarts Lane. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73088, name: JOYOUS GUARD Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
25/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
02/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73088 |
|
|
06/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|