|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Main Erecting shop) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1955 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 73095 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Patricroft (10C) |
||
06/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
28/08/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) | ||
30/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) | ||
27/08/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 73095 | ||
01/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |