Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 772 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6377 Week
» 17924 Month
» 417606 Year
» 494193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73096   11/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 11/1955 to Patricroft (10C)
Withdrawal During 11/1967 off Patricroft (9H)
Service Life 12 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10C Patricroft (New) 11/1955
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 06/09/1958
85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 14/07/1962
85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
2B Oxley w/e 07/11/1964
5E Nuneaton w/e 06/03/1965
6C Croes Newydd w/e 19/06/1965
9H Patricroft w/e 24/07/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10C Patricroft w/e 26/11/1955
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 06/09/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 04/05/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 02/11/1964
ALLOC 2B Oxley 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region w/e 09/11/1964
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9H Patricroft 4w/e 07/08/1965
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 25/11/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1955 To Service To service as BR Number 73096
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Patricroft (10C)
   
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
06/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (9H)    
11/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73096 from Patricroft (9H)    

prev prev