Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17050 Week
» 70066 Month
» 189593 Year
» 3216446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73108 |
m/e |
12/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
on |
30/12/1955 |
ALLOC |
66E |
Carstairs |
4w/e |
05/02/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73108 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carstairs (66E) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73108 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|