|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7312 Built at Swindon Works |
||
01/01/1934 | Allocation | |||
20/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cheltenham Malvern Road (CHEL) | ||
13/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) | ||
05/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (85C) | ||
06/1958 | Modification | Modification: Outside Steam Pipes fitted | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
11/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
06/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
30/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) | ||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7312 |