Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 425 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2871 Week
» 14576 Month
» 346065 Year
» 422652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73129   08/1956

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 08/1956 to Shrewsbury (84G)
Withdrawal During 12/1967 off Patricroft (9H)
Service Life 11 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury (New) 08/1956
26F Patricroft 4w/e 06/09/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/08/1956
1STALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1956
LOAN 26F Patricroft 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 04/10/1958
WDN 9H Patricroft w/e 02/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Operational
Information This loco is in running condition at the Midland Railway Trust at Butterley in Derbyshire
Link http://www.midlandrailway-butterley.co.uk/home/
Status Date 22/03/2013


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1956 To Service To service as BR Number 73129
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 73129 from Patricroft (9H)    

prev prev