Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2991 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16397 Week
» 69413 Month
» 188940 Year
» 3215793 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73146 |
on |
12/02/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73146 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
01/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73146 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|