Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3562 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16968 Week
» 69984 Month
» 189511 Year
» 3216364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
73153 |
on |
24/05/1957 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/02/1963 |
Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings |
The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 73153 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (65J) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 73153 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|