Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 1058 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5632 Week
» 33590 Month
» 68232 Year
» 1289797 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73161 m/e 02/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 02/1957 to Gateshead (52A)
Withdrawal During 12/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Buttigiegs (Newport)
Service Life 7 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
52A Gateshead (New) m/e 02/1957
55E Normanton 4w/e 21/09/1957
55H Neville Hill w/e 23/06/1962
56A Wakefield w/e 22/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 52C Blaydon 27/01/1957
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 19/12/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 73161
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 73161    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Buttigiegs: Newport    

prev prev