Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1013 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5587 Week
» 33545 Month
» 68187 Year
» 1289752 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73162 m/e 02/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 02/1957 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawal During 05/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 8 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
50A York (North) (New) m/e 02/1957
55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 5w/e 15/11/1958
55H Neville Hill w/e 17/06/1961
56A Wakefield w/e 22/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 28/09/1963
81F Oxford 2w/e 10/01/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50A York (North) 15/02/1957
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 55H Neville Hill 5w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 14/09/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 81F Oxford 5w/e 04/01/1965
WDN   4w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1957 To Service To service as BR Number 73162
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield (55G)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 73162    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev