Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 1068 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8528 Week
» 6041 Month
» 233925 Year
» 1455490 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 73166 m/e 03/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 5
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service During 03/1957 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 8 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
50A York (North) (New) m/e 03/1957
55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 5w/e 15/11/1958
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 25/04/1959
55G Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 17/09/1960
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 14/04/1962
55D Royston w/e 15/09/1962
26F Patricroft w/e 22/06/1963
83D Exmouth Junction 4w/e 02/11/1963
83E Yeovil Town 6w/e 12/10/1964
81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 50A York (North) 29/03/1957
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 55D Royston 4w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/08/1959 Doncaster Works (Stripping) Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. SLS/195909
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number 73166
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
11/06/1957 Report Report: On June 11 "A3s" Nos. 60043/90 and 60100, all of Haymarket, were all seen on Leeds, together with "V2s" Nos. 60804 and 60937 of Dundee (Tay Bridge). No. 60937 appeared 100 min. late, piloted by standard Class "5" 4-6-0 No. 73166 (SOA), on the up "North Briton." (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
25/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 73166    

prev prev