Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 775 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14818 Week
» 79772 Month
» 282436 Year
» 3309289 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway (Orig) |
7319 |
m/e |
01/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
43xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
222 |
To Service |
During 01/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 09/10/1964 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 9 mths , 8 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7319 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1934 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (SALOP) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
27/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
09/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7319 |
|
|