|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/1961 | Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1455, 2217, 3210, 3610, 3792, 4110/20, 4290, 4703, 4910/96, 5416, 5563/8/70, 5679, 5957, 6611/68, 7308/39, 7403, 8403, 9464, 9674, 9778. Weigh House : D3034, 1011. Works Yard: 1003/7, 2249, 3201, 3618, 4591, 5548, 5694, 5933, 6314, 6424, 6688, 7244, 73037. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7403 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) | ||
10/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) | ||
11/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7403 | ||
03/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |