Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 522 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14565 Week
» 79519 Month
» 282183 Year
» 3309036 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7409 |
on |
21/08/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
74xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
307 |
To Service |
Thu 21/08/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 17/08/1961 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
21/08/1936 |
CNYD |
|
Croes Newydd |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/08/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7409 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) |
|
|
17/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7409 |
|
|
11/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|