Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3883 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22794 Week
» 87748 Month
» 290412 Year
» 3317265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7416 |
on |
23/12/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
74xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
307 |
To Service |
Mon 23/12/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/01/1959 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
23/12/1936 |
WOS |
|
Worcester |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
HFD |
|
Hereford |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/01/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
WOS |
Worcester |
4w/e |
22/02/1947 |
ALLOC |
HFD |
Hereford |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7416 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
30/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (HFD) |
|
|
19/01/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7416 |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|