Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 652 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19563 Week
» 84517 Month
» 287181 Year
» 3314034 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
7420 |
on |
03/05/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
74xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
307 |
To Service |
Wed 03/05/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 29/07/1959 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/07/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1947 |
Welsh Border Branches |
Leominster-New Radnor & Presteign Branches: Normally 0-4-2T's Nos. 5808 o 5814 work the Presteign branch, the engine being shedded at Kington and provided by Hereford. On 27/9 No. 7420 was on the branch and during that week old 0-4-2T No. 3574 had been working from Worcester on the New Radnor branch, being shedded overnight at Leominster. The re-appearance of No. 3574 on this turn is of exceptional interest, as this loco. is one of the three remaining '517' Class 0-4-2T still in service; the class originally comprised some 165 engines, all of which were built at Wolverhampton Works between 1868 and 1896. Its re-appearance on a passenger train is accounted for by the fact that it had a heavy overhaul at Wolverhampton Works earlier this year, during which it was repainted green. |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/05/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 7420 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hereford (HFD) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
29/07/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7420 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|