|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Swindon Works | New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7432 Built at Swindon Works |
||
17/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
31/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
24/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C) | ||
21/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
19/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) | ||
05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7432 | ||
11/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston |