Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 779 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 779 Week
» 12072 Month
» 276705 Year
» 1498270 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75000 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 390
To Service During 05/1951 to Swindon (82C)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82C Swindon (New) m/e 05/1951
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/09/1951
82C Swindon 4w/e 26/12/1953
84E Tyseley 4w/e 05/09/1959
81F Oxford 4w/e 25/02/1961
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 14/07/1962
84D Leamington 4w/e 08/09/1962
83E Yeovil Town on 08/09/1963
85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 14/07/1962
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1951 Swindon Works 1646 just out, 8470 (YE Co. 2463/51) 9446 (RSH 7583/51) just delivered. Under construction: 1647 (boiler 1547 QA), 1649 (boiler 1549 QA). Frames of 75001 set up, those of 75002 awaiting erection. New tender, BR Type 2, No. 824/51, allocated to 75000. Withdrawals: 1925, the last saddle, had just arrived, 1993, 2026, 2936/47, (2947 was the only remaining 'Court' without out-side steam pipes); 3447/51 (3451 had been withdrawn from store) 4018/41/58. Being cut up in 'C' shop were, 1917, 2192, 4055. Recent top feed boilers observed: 5413, 5736, 4603, 9715/40. Outside steam pipes fitted: 2878, 6393, 7301. Experimental tests: 7916, still undergoing tests of mechanical lubricators, was in the barn, while 43094, with blast pipe modifications, was on the testing plant. Other observations: 5922 has now lost her electric lighting equipment. Of the 94XX received' from outside contractors, 8470 an 9444 were the first of their respective batches to have the red-backed number plates. Bagnalls have not delivered anything further since 8429, and it is believed that they are taking a three months' respite, in order to catch up on industrial and foreign orders. SLS/195107
02/06/1951 Eastbourne Exhibition An exhibition of locomotives, open to the general public, was a big attraction on Saturday afternoon, 2nd June, The exhibits comprised electric loco. No. 20003, Class 7 No. 70009 Alfred the Great, Class 4 No. 75000, Class 5 No. 73001, Fell diesel No. 10100, diesel shunter No. 15227, representing the work of Ashford, Crewe, Swindon, Derby, Derby and Ashford respectively. SLS/195107
02/06/1951 Railway Exhibition At Eastbourne On the occasion of the opening of the Conference of the Internationa, Railway Union on 2/6 in Eastbourne, a very fine exhibition was staged in the goods yard there which was open to the public in brilliant sunshine during the afternoon. Locomotives displayed were: diesel-electric 0-6-0 shunter, No. 15227, built at Ashford; Fell diesel-mechanical 4-8-4, No. 10100; class 4 4-6-0 No. 75000, just completed at Swindon. carrying shedplate 82C; class 5 4-6-0 No. 73001, built at Derby in May; class 7 4-6-2 No. 70009 Alfred the Great, straight from trial express running on the Waterloo-Bournemouth service but normally shedded at Norwich; S.R. 'CC' electric locomotive No. 20003. All except No. 20003 were practically new engines. Many of us saw for the first time on that occasion the 'Fell' locomotive and the smaller standard 4-6-0 type of B.R. creation. All were clean, cold, and available for close inspection, with inspectors and other officials on hand to give information. There were also fine examples of the latest Festival rolling stock, including dining and kitchen cars, goods wagons and vans, semaphore and colour-light signals, bull-headed also flat-bottom track in complete lengths, as well as some small specimens of modern machinery. This was a red-letter day in East Sussex! Alfred the Great hauled the four new coaches down the previous day as a special; No. 75000 towed the D-M, which is a decidedly formidable-looking 'box of tricks.' SLS/195108
31/10/1962 Leamington MPD 41285 has returned from Tyseley after repair; standard class 4 75000 worked the thrice daily Nuneaton parcels turn whilst 41285 was away. 'King' 6016 is still lying here. SLS/196212
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309
15/11/1963 Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75000
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (82C)
   
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75000    

prev