Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 186 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4354 Week
» 19468 Month
» 322658 Year
» 1544223 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75001 on 16/08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 390
To Service Mon 16/08/1951 to Shrewsbury (84G)
Withdrawal Mon 14/12/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 13 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury (New) on 16/08/1951
82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 09/10/1954
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 06/04/1963
83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 14/12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 4w/e 29/09/1963
TOSTORE   3w/e 02/11/1964
WDN   5w/e 04/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/08/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75001
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
14/12/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 75001    

prev prev