Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7815 Week
» 28257 Month
» 365103 Year
» 1586668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75003 on 30/08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 390
To Service Fri 30/08/1951 to Shrewsbury (84G)
Withdrawal Fri 01/10/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Birds (Bridgend)
Service Life 14 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury (New) on 30/08/1951
82C Swindon 4w/e 26/12/1953
85A Worcester 4w/e 22/02/1958
84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1960
83E Yeovil Town on 06/10/1963
85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   on 01/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/11/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D4, D36, D58, D83, D91, D112, D121, D144, D191, D5010, D5023/87. Outside D.E. Shop : D5, D56, D114, D128, D5027. Test House: D5032, D5127. Outside Test House: D9, D115, D5005, Pullman uM60091. Shunter Test House : D2908. New Building : D165, D189, D192/3, D5186-5195. Finishing Shop: D74, D131, D188, D190, D5001/31. Erecting Shop: D87, D93, D118, D3126, 42087, 47326/38/78, 48395, 73011/6/25/46, 73136/41, 75003/14. Paint Shop: M.R. 1000 (Paintwork being touched up). Stone Pit: 47642, 48494, 75013. Foundry Row : D65, D81, 10000, 10202, 42500, 43496, 75056. Klondyke Sidings : ED6, ED7, D5145, D5400. Bone Yard : 10201/3, 42146. On Shed awaiting cut up : 40088. Ex Works on Shed: ED3, D2236 (5B), D2507 (6C), D5021 (1A), 43994, 47000, 73139. SLS/196212
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/08/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75003
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
06/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
01/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75003    

prev prev