Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 120 Today
» 1237 Yesterday
» 1357 Week
» 3939 Month
» 268572 Year
» 1490137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75004 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 390
To Service During 08/1951 to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/03/1967
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 15 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road (New) m/e 08/1951
82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 09/10/1954
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 16/07/1955
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 04/10/1958
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 02/12/1961
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 19/05/1962
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 03/11/1962
6D Shrewsbury w/e 29/01/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 11/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/08/1951
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 4w/e 05/02/1966
WDN   w/e 11/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75004
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
29/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75004    

prev prev