Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75005 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1951 to Shrewsbury (84G)
Withdrawal Thu 18/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Birds (Morriston)
Service Life 14 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84G Shrewsbury (New) m/e 09/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1953
89A Oswestry 4w/e 27/02/1954
6E Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
84E Tyseley w/e 11/04/1959
85A Worcester 4w/e 16/07/1960
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/01/1964
83D Exmouth Junction 6w/e 13/04/1964
83E Yeovil Town 5w/e 16/05/1965
85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1965
   Withdrawn 18/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 08/09/1951
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 27/02/1954
LOAN 6E Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 5w/e 16/05/1965
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   18/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 75005
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. SLS 1/1962 Link
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75005    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Birds: Morriston    

prev prev