Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 178 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4346 Week
» 19460 Month
» 322650 Year
» 1544215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75007 on 25/09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 390
To Service Wed 25/09/1951
Withdrawal Wed 21/04/1965
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Birds (Bynea)
Service Life 13 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 25/09/1951
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 04/10/1958
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 06/04/1963
83E Yeovil Town 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn on 21/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/09/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75007
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
21/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75007    

prev prev