Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 963 Today
» 1058 Yesterday
» 5537 Week
» 33495 Month
» 68137 Year
» 1289702 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75008 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 10/1951
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 14 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 01/11/1958
83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 20/07/1964
83D Exmouth Junction 6w/e 12/10/1964
85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 84G Shrewsbury m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 3w/e 20/07/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 75008
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75008    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev