Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 784 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 16932 Month
» 416614 Year
» 493201 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75014   11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 11/1951 to Patricroft (10C)
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 15 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10C Patricroft (New) 11/1951
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
6A Chester (MR) 8w/e 05/10/1957
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 20/06/1959
6A Chester (MR) w/e 12/09/1959
6B Mold Junction w/e 09/04/1960
1E Bletchley w/e 05/05/1962
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
2A Tyseley w/e 20/06/1964
6D Shrewsbury w/e 19/09/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 10C Patricroft w/e 08/12/1951
NEW 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/12/1951
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 3w/e 03/10/1964
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1951 To Service To service as BR Number 75014
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Patricroft (10C)
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75014    

prev prev