Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 378 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 378 Week
» 22884 Month
» 326074 Year
» 1547639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75022 on 02/12/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 400
To Service Fri 02/12/1953 to Cardiff Canton (86C)
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 12 yrs , 29 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 886 02/12/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
86C Cardiff Canton (New) on 02/12/1953
87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 15/06/1957
86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 10/08/1957
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 04/10/1958
81F Oxford 4w/e 07/10/1961
83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 04/05/1964
82E Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 21/02/1965
83D Exmouth Junction 2w/e 07/03/1965
85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 26/12/1953
NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/12/1953
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 3w/e 04/05/1964
LOAN 82E Bristol Barrow Road 2w/e 21/02/1965
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 2w/e 07/03/1965
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/12/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75022
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)
   
15/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
21/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
07/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
31/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75022    

prev prev