Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 147 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3695 Week
» 4585 Month
» 312566 Year
» 1196947 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75025 m/e 04/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 04/1954 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira (New) m/e 04/1954
82C Swindon m/e 16/06/1956
85A Worcester 4w/e 30/11/1957
89C Machynlleth 4w/e 13/08/1960
85A Worcester 4w/e 03/12/1960
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/01/1964
83D Exmouth Junction 6w/e 13/04/1964
85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 30/04/1954
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/01/1964
ALLOC 83D Exmouth Junction 5w/e 30/03/1964
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 75025
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75025    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev