Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 764 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6369 Week
» 17916 Month
» 417598 Year
» 494185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75027   05/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1954 to Laira (83D)
Withdrawal During 08/1968
Service Life 14 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira (New) 05/1954
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/10/1954
81F Oxford 4w/e 01/01/1955
82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1959
82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 27/02/1960
89C Machynlleth 2w/e 17/11/1962
89B Croes Newydd w/e 09/03/1963
8K Bank Hall w/e 06/02/1965
8L Aintree w/e 22/10/1966
10G Skipton w/e 12/11/1966
10A Carnforth w/e 21/01/1967
12E Tebay w/e 22/04/1967
10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 22/05/1954
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1954
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 10G Skipton 5w/e 12/11/1966
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 01/02/1967
ALLOC 12E Tebay 4w/e 06/05/1967
ALLOC 10A Carnforth w/e 06/01/1968
WDN 10A Carnforth w/e 03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 75027
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (82G)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
06/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
12/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
21/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12E)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 75027    

prev prev