Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 129 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 129 Week
» 6263 Month
» 234147 Year
» 1455712 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75028 m/e 05/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 400
To Service During 05/1954
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 11 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1954
83D Laira 4w/e 19/06/1954
89A Oswestry m/e 16/06/1956
6E Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
6K Rhyl w/e 20/06/1959
6E Chester West w/e 12/09/1959
11B Workington w/e 09/04/1960
6B Mold Junction w/e 11/06/1960
6K Rhyl w/e 10/06/1961
6B Mold Junction w/e 09/09/1961
1E Bletchley w/e 05/05/1962
6F Machynlleth w/e 19/06/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 11/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1954
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 89A Oswestry 4w/e 16/06/1956
LOAN 6E Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/09/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6E Chester West 3w/e 26/09/1959
LOAN 11B Workington 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 6F Machynlleth 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 11/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. SLS/195904
07/09/1962 Derby Works (Stone Pitt) Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). SLS/196210

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1954 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75028
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Oswestry (89A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (11B)    
11/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F)    
11/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 75028    

prev prev