Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 429 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2875 Week
» 14580 Month
» 346069 Year
» 422656 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 75029   05/1954

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1954
Withdrawal During 08/1967
Service Life 13 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83D Laira 4w/e 19/06/1954
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/10/1954
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 04/12/1954
81F Oxford 4w/e 01/01/1955
27C Southport w/e 18/10/1958
81F Oxford 4w/e 24/01/1959
82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1959
81F Oxford 4w/e 03/12/1960
84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/01/1961
89C Machynlleth 2w/e 17/11/1962
89B Croes Newydd w/e 09/03/1963
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 19/06/1965
6D Shrewsbury w/e 03/09/1966
6C Croes Newydd w/e 11/03/1967
5D Stoke w/e 10/06/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/05/1954
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 01/01/1955
LOAN 27C Southport 4w/e 01/11/1958
EXLOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 81F Oxford m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/01/1961
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 6D Shrewsbury 5w/e 10/09/1966
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 5w/e 08/04/1967
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN   w/e 12/08/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1954 To Service To service as BR Number 75029
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
18/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
03/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
29/04/1967 Sightings A visit to Wigan Springs Branch shed: On shed - Dead John Thickitt Link
10/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
08/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75029    

prev prev