Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 192 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5413 Week
» 20527 Month
» 323717 Year
» 1545282 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75030 on 15/06/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 15/06/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/12/1967
Scrapping During 07/1968 at Arnott Young (Carmyle)
Service Life 14 yrs, 6 mths , 15 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 894 15/06/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 15/06/1953
6G Llandudno Junction 8w/e 19/06/1954
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
1E Bletchley 4w/e 29/12/1956
6D Chester Northgate w/e 07/11/1959
1A Willesden w/e 09/01/1960
2B Nuneaton w/e 19/01/1963
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 30/12/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 20/06/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1953
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 12E Tebay 5w/e 10/06/1967
WDN 12E Tebay w/e 30/12/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/08/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 29th August. Paint shop- 40010 G, 42369 G, 43948 I, 44147 I, 47635 I, 75039 G, D3542/3 new, D5001 new; Diesel shop- 10203, 15000 I, 15004 Casual, D3544-D3554 (order no. 658); Erecting shop-1 bay, 40038 G, 42420 I, 42526 G, 44035 I, 44519 G, 44577 G, 47236 G, 47574 G, 47597 G, 48410 I, 75017 I, 75030/3 G, 80137 I, 80138 G, also 53803, 75032, 80061; Erecting shop-2 bay, 43621 G, 44045 I, 44241 G, 44371 G, 47230 G, 48642 G, 48672 G, 53805 I, also 44046 an 48461; Erecting shop-3 bay, 10 Bo-Bos (D5002-11, three engines in), 3 1-Co-Co-ls (D1-3, no engines in). Yard- 40047, 40680, 41078, 41156, 42508, 43631, 43918, 47309, 48176, 75013 an 12098. Test House- D5000 an 10800. SLS/195809
31/10/1959 Chester Northgate MPD Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. SLS/196003
16/10/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D6, D211, D312, D2908/9/13, D5084/9, 10203, 11146. Diesel Test House: D3, D138/9, D226, 11145, 12100. Shunter Test House: 12096. New Building: D142-D151. Finishing Shop: D76, D140/1, D5024, D8000. Erecting Shop: D3578, 12078, 13122/3, 42198, 42368, 42421, 44172/8, 44213/94, 44436, 47250, 47350/88/99, 48001/53/7, 48356, 48439, 58850 frames only, 73073, 73137/59, 75015/30/5. Paint Shop: 42408, 44185, 48491, 73010. In Works Sidings: ED3, D1, D10, D43, D75, D89, D2501, D5143, 10202, 12000/54, 41168, 41804, 42328, 42404, 42510/21/4, 43295, 43593, 43905, 44033, 44232/48, 47218/68/98, 47529, 47666, 48009/10, 48185, 48380, 73158, 75017, 92059. SLS/196111
05/11/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. SLS/196112
17/11/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex-Works on Shed) Ex-Works on Shed: D211, D5024, 41804, 42421, 44241, 48185, 48467, 73073, 75030/52. SLS/196112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75030
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
30/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 75030    

prev prev