Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 116 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5337 Week
» 20451 Month
» 323641 Year
» 1545206 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 75031 on 16/06/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Riddles
Class Standard Class 4
Company History BR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 401
To Service Sat 16/06/1953 to Bletchley (1E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 12 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
BR2 895 16/06/1953 BR 3,500g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1E Bletchley (New) on 16/06/1953
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
6H Bangor 4w/e 18/05/1957
6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 10/08/1957
6A Chester (MR) 8w/e 05/10/1957
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 20/06/1959
6A Chester (MR) w/e 12/09/1959
6B Mold Junction w/e 09/04/1960
6K Rhyl w/e 10/06/1961
1A Willesden w/e 09/09/1961
21D Aston w/e 29/12/1962
5D Stoke w/e 21/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 1E Bletchley w/e 20/06/1953
NEW NYA   m/e 30/06/1953
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 21D Aston 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   w/e 12/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1959 Derby Works (Erecting shop No 1 bay) Paint shop-42396I, 42501I, 44426I, 48010G, 48517G, D5010 new. Diesel erecting shop-10202, 10800, 11127, 12001, 12066, 12088, 13028, 6 0-6-0 DIE shunters (new work), (D3763-8). Erecting shop No 1 bay-40684I, 42409G, 42515G, 43850 G, 44123 I, 44134 I, 44179 G, 47454 G, 47645 G, 47679 I, 48141 I, 48335 G, 73142 I, 73157 I, 75015 I, 75028 G, 75031 G, 75041 G, stripping-42522, 44162, 48621, 80067. Erecting shop No. 2 bay-42374I, 44102 G, 44130 I, 47425 I, 48223(1), 73130 I, 73141 I, stripping-42529, 47526. Erecting shop No. 3 bay-6 Bo-Bo (D5014-19 new) 1160 H.P. D/E, 4 1Co-Col 2300 H.P. D/E Yard-40047/564/680/1000/49/143/57/65, 42354/509/98, 43292/324, 44145/599, 47309, 48194/304/653/699, 10001, 10100, D5009/13 and Cecil Raikes. All stored locos. remain with following additions-47563 (opp. station and not for scrap), 40461, 41121, 43553/946/70, 47426 (opp. m.p.d.). *41000 was noted on 22nd March in the Erecting shop stripped down; also noted on this date in the shops were 40671 an 53807. SLS/195904
15/12/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. SLS/196201
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/06/1953 To Service To service as British Railways Number 75031
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bletchley (1E)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
31/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (21D)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
12/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 75031    

prev prev